Quants Questions: Hacks on Square of a Number


विशेषकर बैंक और बीमा जैसे परीक्षाओं में ज्यादातर मामलों में मात्रात्मक योग्यता या क्वांटिटेटिव एप्टीट्यूड कठिन होता है। कई बैंकों की परीक्षा में दो-स्तरीय परीक्षा पैटर्न होते हैं, जैसे कि प्रीलीयर और मेन्स। उनमें से अधिकांश ने अपने परीक्षा पैटर्न को बदल दिया है और प्रत्येक खंड पर 20 मिनट का अनुभागीय समय निर्धारित किया है। मात्रात्मक योग्यता प्रत्येक परीक्षा के लिए महत्वपूर्ण है क्योंकि उचित रणनीति और पर्याप्त अभ्यास आपको इस खंड में पूर्ण अंक प्राप्त करने में मदद कर सकता है। लेंग्वेज अनुभाग में आश्वासन नहीं दिया जा सकता है और आप रीजनिंग के प्रश्नों को हल करते समय अटक सकते हैं, लेकिन क्वैंट एक स्कोरिंग विषय है और गणना सही होने पर पूर्ण अंक भी मिलते हैं।


तो क्वांट में आपकी सहायता करने और परीक्षा के घंटों के दौरान अपना कीमती समय बचाने के लिए Adda247 एस्पिरेंट्स की मदद करने के लिए कुछ क्वांट ट्रिक लेकर आया  है।

संख्याओं के वर्ग -

1.  20-30 से वर्ग करना 

(21)= 441, (22)2= 484, (23)2=529, (24)2=576, (25)2=625

Now tens and unit digit of a number repeats after (25)

(26)2=676, (27)2=729, (28)2=784, (29)2=841.

Note- last 2 digits repeat here after the square of 25.

2.   30-40  से वर्ग करना 

(30)2=30*30=900

Use this formula to calculate the square: (a+b)2= a2+b2+2ab

(31)2= (30+1)2= (30)2+1+2*30*1)= 900+ 1+ 60=961

(32)2= (30+2)2= (30)2+ (2)2+2*30*2=900+4+120= 1024.

or we can write 32 as (2)5=(32)2=[(2)5]2=(2)10= 1024 this is an important number.
.
3.  40-50 से वर्ग करना: 

The square from 40-50, unit and tens places of square decreases from the square of 10 to 1.

(40)2= 1600, (41)2= 1681 (42)2= 1764 (43)2= 1849(44)2= 1936(46)2= 2116

(45)2= 2025

or we can calculate it by-
a) (45)2= tens digit*(tens digit+1) 
b) 25 as constant
c) sum of (difference of digits*50)= 2025

(46)2= 2116 (47)2= 2209 (48)2= 2304(49)2= 2401

3.  50-60 से वर्ग करना :
(50)2= 2500
Half of 50 i.e 25, add the unit digit to 25, square of the unit digit.  
(51)2= (half of 50)+1 and square of 1 i.e 2601
(52)2=( half of 50)+2 and square of 2 i.e 2704
(53)2= (Half of 50)+3 and square of 3 i.e 2809
(54)2= 2916.
(55)2= 3025.

Or you can find the square of 55 by 
a) (55)2= tens digit*(tens digit+1) 
b) 25 as constant
c) sum of (difference of digits*50)= 3025.

6.  11 की गुणज संख्याओं का वर्ग : 

step1. Count number of 1s.
step2. then write the subsequent numbers of 1 till the number of 1s.
step3. then decrease the subsequent number.
(11)2= 121 [ number of 1 is 2, write subsequent number till number of 1]

(111)2= 12321[ here number of one is 3],

(1111)2= 1234321[ here number of one is 4]

before further calculating square, you must know the shortcut to multiplication by 11.

a) 74*11
step1. unit digit and the tens digit is as usual- (7_4)
step2. addition of digits- (7+4)
74*11= 814

b) 46*11= 506

Now calculating more squares

(22)2= 4*121 or 4*11*11= 484, (33)2= 9*121=1089

(44)2= 16*121= 16*11*11= 16*11=176*11


multiplication of 176*11


step1. now 176*11= ones and tens digit (1 and 6) is as usual
step2. addition of (7&6)= 13 and take 3 and 1 is the carry
step3. addition of (1&7)= 8 and carry of step2 is added=9
so the multiplication of 176*11= 1936.

अब आप स्वयं करें -
1. (222)2+(333)2
2. (66)2
3. (25)2+ (35)2+(45)2